EP0421676 - Interfacially polymerized membranes, and reverse osmosis separation of organic solvent solutions using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Black, Laura Elizabeth 1101 Cathcart Boulevard Sarnia, Ontario, N7S 2H4 / CA | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310610.2 | 27.09.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | US19890417333 | 05.10.1989 Original published format: US 417333 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421676 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421676 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/12 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
B01D69/1251 (EP,US);
C10G31/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/15] | Title | German: | Grenzflächenpolymerisierte Verbundmembranen und umkehrosmotische Trennung von Lösungen organischer Lösemittel mittels dieser Verbundmembranen | [1991/15] | English: | Interfacially polymerized membranes, and reverse osmosis separation of organic solvent solutions using them | [1991/15] | French: | Membranes produites par polymérisation interfaciale et leur utilisation pour la séparation par osmose inverse de solutions de solvants organiques | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62191006 ; | [A]JP62247808 ; | [A]EP0211633 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | Examination | US4277344 |