EP0422803 - Dentifrice comprising cationic antibacterial agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beecham Group p.l.c. SB House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states Beecham Group p.l.c. SB House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alexander, Stephen Edward, SmithKline Beecham Con. Brands, St. George's Avenue Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0DE / GB | 02 /
Doel, Geoffrey Royston, SmithKline Beecham Con. Brands, St. George's Avenue Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0DE / GB | 03 /
Edwards, Peter John, SmithKline Beecham Con. Brands, St. George's Avenue Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0DE / GB | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Connell, Anthony Christopher, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Connell, Anthony Christopher, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | ||
Former [1991/16] | Lockwood, Barbara Ann SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310633.4 | 28.09.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | GB19890022920 | 11.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8922920 | GB19890022921 | 11.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8922921 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0422803 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0422803 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP);
A61K8/416 (EP);
A61K8/43 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Zahnreinigungsmittel, das ein kationisches bakterizides Mittel enthält | [1991/16] | English: | Dentifrice comprising cationic antibacterial agent | [1991/16] | French: | Dentifrice contenant un agent bactéricide cationique | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 26.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/23] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/23] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60109516 ; | [A]JP61130212 ; | [X]US3937805 ; | [X]US3934002 ; | [XP]EP0372603 ; | [X]EP0177303 ; | [X]EP0010961 | [X] - DERWENT DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 85-181164 [30], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP - A - 60 109 516 (KAO CORP.) 15-06-1985, & JP60109516 A 00000000 | [A] - DERWENT DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 86-199663 [31], Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP - A - 61 130 212 (LION CORP.) 18-06-1986, & JP61130212 A 00000000 |