EP0420678 - Fluid viscoelastic test apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIENCO, Inc. 9188 S. Turkey Creek Road Morrison Colorado / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states SIENCO, Inc. 9188 S. Turkey Creek Road Morrison, Colorado / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henderson, Jon H. 10589 Pierson Circle Westminster, Colorado 80021 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310657.3 | 28.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890414682 | 29.09.1989 Original published format: US 414682 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0420678 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0420678 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/24, G01N3/32, G01N33/48 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
G01N29/032 (EP,US);
G01N11/16 (EP,US);
G01N33/4905 (EP,US);
G05D23/1906 (EP,US);
G05D23/24 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02818 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2698 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/14] | G05D23/24, G01N3/32, G01N33/49 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Viskoelastizität von Flüssigkeiten | [1991/14] | English: | Fluid viscoelastic test apparatus and method | [1991/14] | French: | Appareil et méthode de test de viscoélasticité pour fluide | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 21.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP6061815 ; | [A]US4040788 (SIMONS SANFORD L, et al); | [A]FR2378308 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [Y]DE3237406 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [YP]FR2631140 (CEPE [FR]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 195 (P-379)[1918], 13th August 1985; & JP-A-60 61 815 (FUJITSU) 09-04-1985, & JP6061815 A 00000000 |