EP0423970 - Low insertion force, low board stress electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanevich, Kenneth W. 54646 Avondale Drive New Baltimore, Michigan 48047 / US | 02 /
Regnier, Kent E. 541 S. Grace Lombard, Illinois 60148 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [1991/17] | Hughes, Brian Patrick Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310783.7 | 02.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | US19890422703 | 17.10.1989 Original published format: US 422703 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0423970 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0423970 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423970 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/68 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
H01R12/83 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/17] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder mit geringer Einschubkraft und geringer Leiterplattenbelastung | [1991/17] | English: | Low insertion force, low board stress electrical connector | [1991/17] | French: | Connecteur électrique à faible force d'insertion et à contrainte de plaque réduite | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4832617 (BROWN RICHARD [US]); | [Y]FR1543470 (SOCAPEX); | [A]US4718859 (GARDNER MICHAEL J [US]) |