EP0425111 - Improved self keyer with pre-emphasized fill video [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Grass Valley Group, Inc. 13024 Bitney Springs Road Nevada City California 95959 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states The Grass Valley Group, Inc. 13024 Bitney Springs Road Nevada City California 95959 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaplin, Daniel J. 11878 Brentwood Court Nevada City, California 95959 / US | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90310863.7 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | US19890418353 | 06.10.1989 Original published format: US 418353 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0425111 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0425111 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0425111 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/275 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
H04N5/275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/18] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Tastschaltung mit Hervorhebung des Ausfüllen-Videosignals | [1991/18] | English: | Improved self keyer with pre-emphasized fill video | [1991/18] | French: | Circuit de commutation amélioré avec un signal vidéo de remplissage préaccentué | [1991/18] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.12.1994 | NL | 14.12.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/41] | NL | 14.12.1994 | |
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 14.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4141041 (PETERS DAVID L); | [A]GB1556811 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP) |