EP0423981 - An air bag for an automotive inflatable occupant restraint system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abramczyk, William Michael 910 Hadley Rochester, Michigan 48063 / US | 02 /
Hull, Edward Irving 4015 Pinehurst West Bloomfield, Michigan 48322 / US | 03 /
Feustel, James Robert 1680 Morehead Ann Arbor, Michigan 48103 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90310904.9 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | US19890421882 | 16.10.1989 Original published format: US 421882 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423981 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423981 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B60R21/239 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/17] | Title | German: | Luftsack für eine aufblasbare Fahrzeuginsassenrückhaltevorrichtung | [1991/17] | English: | An air bag for an automotive inflatable occupant restraint system | [1991/17] | French: | Sac d'air pour un système gonflable de retenue pour passagers dans une voiture | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0061828 (THIOKOL CORP [US]); | [X]DE896312 (LINDERER WALTER); | [XP]WO9009908 (AUTOMOTIVE TECH INT [US]); | [A]FR2131070 (FERODO SA) |