EP0422876 - Method of and apparatus for controlling waste water treatment by anaerobic fermentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO., LTD. 2-16-1, Kyobashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [1991/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Makoto, c/o Shimizu Constr. Co. Ltd. 2-16-1, Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | 02 /
Hake, John 2570 Carisbrook Dr. Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 03 /
Okamura, Kazuo, c/o Shimizu Construction Co. Ltd. 2-16-1, Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | 04 /
Minami, Kiyoshi, c/o Shimizu Construction Co. Ltd. 2-16-1, Kyobashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Diamond, Bryan Clive, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [1991/16] | Application number, filing date | 90311013.8 | 08.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890263762 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26376289 | JP19890263763 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26376389 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422876 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/28, G01N33/18 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/1866 (EP,US);
C02F3/006 (EP,US);
C02F3/28 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP,US);
C12M41/46 (EP,US);
C02F2209/02 (EP,US);
C02F2209/06 (EP,US);
C02F2209/36 (EP,US);
C02F2209/38 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für die Steuerung von Abwasseraufbereitung durch anaerobe Gärung | [1991/16] | English: | Method of and apparatus for controlling waste water treatment by anaerobic fermentation | [1991/16] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la commande de traitement d'eau usée par fermentation anaérobic | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/35] | 01.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE WATER POLLUTION CONTROL FEDERATION. vol. 60, no. 1, January 1988, WASHINGTON US pages 107 - 112; Y.C.Chung et al.: "ATP as a measure of anaerobic sludge digester activity" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 112, no. 10, 05 March 1990 Columbus, Ohio, USA Adney, William S. et al.: "Detection of extracellular hydrolytic enzymes in the anaerobic digestion of municipal solid waste" page 386; ref. no. 83397Q |