EP0428264 - A method for generating an access plan in a database system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boykin, James Rusell 1615 Azores Drive Pflugerville, Texas 78660 / US | 02 /
Kurzejeski, Lisa Ann Geer 135 Tanglewood Trail Elgin, Texas 78621 / US | 03 /
Horn, Gary Randall 12046 Lincolnshire Austin, 78758 / US | 04 /
Malkemus, Timothy Ray 1602 Rock Creek Drive Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Davies, Simon Robert, et al I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al I B M UK Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1991/21] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311016.1 | 08.10.1990 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | US19890421478 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: US 421478 | [1991/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0428264 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0428264 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/40, G06F15/401 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
G06F16/2365 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Zugriffsplans in einem Datenbanksystem | [1991/21] | English: | A method for generating an access plan in a database system | [1991/21] | French: | Méthode pour générer un plan d'accés dans un système de base de données | [1991/21] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/20] | 18.08.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.03.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/20] | Appeal following examination | 28.08.1998 | Appeal received No. T0095/99 | 22.12.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.07.2001 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2001/28] | 11.10.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/41] | 18.03.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ANGEWANDTE INFORMATIK. APPLIED INFORMATICS. vol. 30, no. 1, January 1988, BRAUNSCHWEIG DE pages 18 - 26; J. RÖHRLE & K. KRATZER: 'Verwaltung von Intergritätsbedingungen in einem Datenwörterbuch' | [A] - THE 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ENTITY-RELATIONSHIP APPROACH 28 October 1985, CHICAGO,USA pages 295 - 302; A. DOGAC ET AL: 'The Design and Implementation of an Integrity Subsystem for the Relational DBMS RAP' |