EP0422904 - Method of driving antiferroelectric liquid crystal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koden, Mitsuhiro Reinbou Manshyon Kawaramachi 401, 27-6 Nishikitsuji-cho, Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Numao, Takaji 1-1-302, Saidaijikunimi-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311065.8 | 09.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890263556 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26355689 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0422904 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0422904 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
C07C57/32 (KR);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G09G3/3633 (EP);
G09G2310/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern eines antiferroelektrischen Flüssigkristallgeräts | [1991/16] | English: | Method of driving antiferroelectric liquid crystal device | [1991/16] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un dispositif à cristaux liquides antiferroélectriques | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 04.10.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1213390 ; | [X]EP0334628 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP], et al) | [XP] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 29, no. 9, September 1990, TOKYO JP pages 1757 - 1764; Y. YAMADA, ET AL.: 'Ferroelectric liquid crystal display using tristable switching' | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 523 (C-657)21 November 1989 & JP-A-1 213 390 ( CHISSO CORP. ) 28 August 1989, & JP1213390 A 19890828 |