EP0424025 - Punch and die set having improved slug management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/03] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakermans, Johannes Cornelis Wilhelmus 3809 Darby Road Harrisburg, Pennsylvania 17109 / US | 02 /
Deimler, John David 915 Hickory Avenue Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | 03 /
Reavis, Ronnie Wayne 155 Conrad Circle Lewisville, North Carolina 27023 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311131.8 | 11.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | US19890425265 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: US 425265 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424025 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424025 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21D45/06 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B21D45/006 (EP,US);
B21D45/08 (KR);
B26D7/18 (EP,US);
B26F1/12 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2055 (EP,US);
Y10T83/217 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2179 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/17] | Title | German: | Stanzstempel- und Gesenkvorrichtung mit verbessertem Stanzteilbehandlungssystem | [1991/17] | English: | Punch and die set having improved slug management system | [1991/17] | French: | Dispositif de poinçon et matrice avec système perfectionné de traitement de flans | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/33] | Request for further processing for: | 03.08.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 03.08.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.08.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2062977 ; | [A]DE3000512 (GANZ MUESZER MUEVEK); | [A]DE2600512 ; | [A]DE2939439 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG) |