EP0424159 - Aseptic processing of allograft bone and tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.12.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.1994 [1994/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSTEOTECH, INC. 1151E Shrewsbury Avenue Shrewsbury New Jersey 07701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states OSTEOTECH, INC. 1151E Shrewsbury Avenue Shrewsbury New Jersey 07701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Callen, John P. 88 Windsor Drive Eatontown, New Jersey 07724 / US | 02 /
O'Leary, Robert K. 110 St. Clair Avenue Spring Lake, New Jersey 07762 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1991/17] | Marsh, Roy David Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311464.3 | 18.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | US19890424339 | 19.10.1989 Original published format: US 424339 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0424159 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0424159 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, A61L27/00, A61L2/08 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
A61L2/0011 (EP);
A61L2/0035 (EP);
A61L2/0094 (EP);
A61L2/04 (EP);
A61L2/08 (EP);
A61L2/20 (EP);
A61L27/36 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/17] | A61L2/00, A61L27/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/17] | Title | German: | Aseptische Behandlung von Knochen- und Gewebeallotransplantaten | [1991/17] | English: | Aseptic processing of allograft bone and tissue | [1991/17] | French: | Traitement aseptique d'allogreffes osseuses et tissulaires | [1991/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/06] | 05.09.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0012959 (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH]); | [A]US4637931 (SCHMITZ JOHN P [US]); | [A]US4456589 (HOLMAN DANIEL G [US], et al); | [A]DE3014123 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]); | [A]DE2004553 |