EP0424163 - Translation look ahead based cache access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Celtruda, Joseph Orazio 83 Dogwood Road Hopewell Junction, New York 12533 / US | 02 /
Hua, Kien Anh 168A Tanglewood Road West Hurley, New York 12491 / US | 03 /
Hunt, Anderson Herrick 216 Albany Avenue Kingston, New York 12401 / US | 04 /
Liu, Lishing 196 Deerfield Lane North Pleasantville, New York / US | 05 /
Peir, Jih-Kwon 15 Crosby Court Fishkill, New York 12524 / US | 06 /
Pruett, David Raymond 8 Cherry Lane Saugerties, New York 12477 / US | 07 /
Temple III, Joseph Lester 1 Hook Street Hurley, New York 12443 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Bailey, Geoffrey Alan IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311473.4 | 18.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | US19890424496 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: US 424496 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0424163 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0424163 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/10, G06F12/08 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
G06F12/1054 (EP,US);
G06F9/383 (EP,US);
G06F9/3832 (EP,US);
G06F2212/654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/17] | Title | German: | Auf Übersetzungsvorausschau basierender Cache-Zugriff | [1991/17] | English: | Translation look ahead based cache access | [1991/17] | French: | Accès antémémoire basé sur prévision de traduction | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 07.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/44] | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4400774 (TOY WING N [US]) | [A] - FUJITSU-SCIENTIFIC AND TECHNICAL JOURNAL. vol. 23, no. 4, 1987, KAWASAKI JP pages 201 - 215; H. TONE ET AL.: 'Development concepts and hardware architecture of the FACOM M-780 model group ' | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 3B, August 1982, NEW YORK US pages 1740 - 1745; J.H. POMERENE ET AL.: 'Mechanism for acceleration of cache references ' | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS 1990 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE & PROCESSORS; 17th - 19th September 1990, Cambridge, US, pages 408 - 412, IEEE, New York, US; K. HUA et al.: "Early resolution of address translation in cache design" |