EP0426450 - Method of wiring/piping confirmation of a multiple air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tatematsu, Makoto, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Toshimasa, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corporation, 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Muir, Ian Robertson, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Muir, Ian R., et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90311922.0 | 31.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | JP19890283921 | 31.10.1989 Original published format: JP 28392189 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426450 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426450 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,KR);
F24F11/57 (EP,KR,US);
F24F1/26 (KR);
F24F11/61 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/63 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/83 (EP,KR);
F24F11/84 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/86 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/871 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1991/19] | Title | German: | Zustandsbestätigungsverfahren für die Verkabelung/Leitungen einer Mehrzonenklimaanlage | [1991/19] | English: | Method of wiring/piping confirmation of a multiple air conditioner | [1991/19] | French: | Procédé pour la confirmation de l'état du câblage/de la tuyauterie d'un système de climatisation à plusieurs zones | [1991/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 28.12.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP1247938 ; | [A]JP57108536 ; | [A]JP62238933 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 591 (M-913)26 December 1989 & JP-A-1 247 938 ( AISIN SEIKI ) 3 October 1989, & JP1247938 A 19891003 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 201 (M-163)13 October 1982 & JP-A-57 108 536 ( MITSUBISHI ) 6 July 1982, & JP57108536 A 19820706 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 109 (M-682)8 April 1988 & JP-A-62 238 933 ( MITSUBISHI ) 19 October 1987, & JP62238933 A 19871019 |