EP0427563 - Apparatus and method for installation of multi-pin components on circuit boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED INTERCONNECTIONS CORPORATION 3 Energy Way West Warwick Rhode Island 02893 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states ADVANCED INTERCONNECTIONS CORPORATION 3 Energy Way West Warwick Rhode Island 02893 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murphy, James V. 28 Ladderlook Road Warwick, Rhode Island / US | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312283.6 | 09.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | US19890434871 | 09.11.1989 Original published format: US 434871 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0427563 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0427563 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/09, H05K7/10 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
H01R12/52 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49153 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53183 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/20] | H01R9/09 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zum Montieren von Mehrstiftskomponenten auf Schaltungsplatten | [1991/20] | English: | Apparatus and method for installation of multi-pin components on circuit boards | [1991/20] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour installer des composants multibroche sur des plaques de circuit | [1991/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 28.09.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5873139 ; | [A]US3383648 (ADAM TEMS); | [A]EP0188751 (BRINTEC SYSTEMS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0321212 (AMP INC [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 166 (E-188)(1311) 21 July 1983, & JP-A-58 73139 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 02 May 1983,, & JP5873139 A 19830502 |