EP0430539 - Ocular implants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VISIONEX, INC. 1206 Sargent Drive Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states VISIONEX, INC. 1206 Sargent Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Vernon G. 10908 Rosemont Drive Rockville, Maryland 20852 / US | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312612.6 | 20.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | US19890440344 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: US 440344 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0430539 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0430539 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430539 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
A61K9/0051 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Augeneinlage | [1991/23] | English: | Ocular implants | [1991/23] | French: | Insert ophtalmique | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 28.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Request for further processing for: | 11.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.11.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.1994 | DK | 12.10.1994 | GR | 12.10.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
DK | 12.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 12.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3960150 (HUSSAIN ANWAR A, et al); | [A]US4300557 (REFOJO MIGUEL F, et al); | [XD]US4439198 (BRIGHTMAN II ALAN H [US], et al); | [X]EP0251680 (IOLAB INC [US]); | [XD]EP0322319 (WONG VERNON G) | [Y] - J.E.F. REYNOLDS: "Martindale - The extra pharmacopoeia", 28th edition, 1982, pages 1587-1590,1698, The Pharmaceutical Press, London, GB |