EP0430542 - Method of producing flexible tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA MACHIDA SEISAKUSHO 13-8, Honkomagome 6-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Kenichi, 328-16, Kokuki, Shiraoka-Machi Minamisaitama-Gun Saitama-Ken / JP | 02 /
Nobuhara, Toshihide, 16-15-202, Shiratori 2-chome Katsushika-Ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1991/23] | Application number, filing date | 90312622.5 | 20.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | JP19890307616 | 29.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30761689 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0430542 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0430542 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29D23/22, F16L11/00, A61M25/00, A61B1/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
A61M25/0012 (EP);
A61B1/0055 (EP);
B29D23/001 (EP);
F16L11/10 (EP);
A61M25/0045 (EP);
A61M25/005 (EP);
B29K2705/00 (EP);
B29K2705/08 (EP);
B29L2023/007 (EP);
B29L2031/7542 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/23] | B29D23/22, F16L11/00, B29C53/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von flexiblen Röhrchen | [1991/23] | English: | Method of producing flexible tube | [1991/23] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de tubes flexibles | [1991/23] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 29.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/08] | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB694655 ; | [A]US2329286 ; | [A]FR1196284 ; | [A]GB2214598 ; | [A]FR1593155 ; | [A]FR2071500 | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, VOL. 10, NO. 97 (P-446), 15TH APRIL 1986; & JP-A-S60 230 614 (OLYMPUS KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 16-11-1985 | [Y] - WPI DISCLOSURE, WEEK 8949, CLASS A, ACCESSION NO. 89-362197 [49], DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD, LONDON, GB; | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19891010), vol. 306, no. 036 | [Y] - MODERN PLASTICS INTERNATIONAL, vol. 15, no. 7, July 1985, page 20, Lausanne, CH; A. WORSWICK: "Make thin-walled, hollow meltable cores" |