EP0486736 - Food product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1995 | Change - representative | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barnes, Douglas J. c/o Unilever Research Colworth Laboratory Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
Clark, Elsie M. Unilever Research Colworth Laboratory Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 03 /
Denton, Saffron Unilever Research Colworth Laboratory Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Butler, David John, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | Butler, David John, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1992/22] | Roscoe, Brian Corrie UNILEVER PLC Patents Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312656.3 | 21.11.1990 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486736 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A21D13/00 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
A21D13/32 (EP);
A21D13/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/32] |
Former [1992/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittel | [1992/22] | English: | Food product | [1992/22] | French: | Aliment | [1992/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.11.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LU | 07.07.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 28.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/14] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.01.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0342124 ; | [X]DE3709703 ; | [X]DE552602 ; | [X]NL8100325 ; | [X]US3250626 ; | [X]DE846233 |