EP0432929 - Polyaniline dispersion and method for making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barry, Neilson Carey Junior 158 Woodhaven Drive Spartanburg, South Carolina 29302 / US | 02 /
Kuhn, Hans Heinrich 176 West Park Drive Spartanburg, South Carolina 29302 / US | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | ||
Former [1991/25] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E. Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312771.0 | 23.11.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | US19890448459 | 11.12.1989 Original published format: US 448459 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0432929 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0432929 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/02, H01B1/12, H01M4/60 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
C08G73/1046 (EP);
C08G73/1071 (EP);
H01B1/128 (EP);
H01M4/60 (EP);
H01M4/66 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | Polyanilin-Dispersion und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1991/25] | English: | Polyaniline dispersion and method for making same | [1991/25] | French: | Dispersion de polyaniline et méthode pour la préparer | [1991/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 15.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/09] | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2554822 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]); | [A]EP0279407 (MITSUI MINING CO LTD [JP]) |