EP0437932 - Inserts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P.S.M. INTERNATIONAL PLC Longacres Willenhall West Midlands WV13 2JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states P.S.M. INTERNATIONAL PLC Longacres Willenhall West Midlands WV13 2JS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Highfield, Anthony Michael 5 Upper Dingle Fairway, Ironbridge, Shropshire / GB | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2 JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al GEORGE FUERY & CO Whitehall Chambers 23 Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312807.2 | 26.11.1990 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | GB19900001046 | 17.01.1990 Original published format: GB 9001046 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0437932 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0437932 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437932 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/12 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
F16B37/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Einsatzteil | [1991/30] | English: | Inserts | [1991/30] | French: | Insert | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.1994 | BE | 10.08.1994 | CH | 10.08.1994 | DK | 10.08.1994 | ES | 10.08.1994 | GR | 10.08.1994 | IT | 10.08.1994 | LI | 10.08.1994 | NL | 10.08.1994 | SE | 10.11.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
ES | 10.08.1994 | ||
GR | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
GR | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
DK | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
NL | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
CH | 10.08.1994 | ||
LI | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 10.08.1994 | |
LI | 10.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2184350 (ITW LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2504616 (PSM FASTENERS LTD [GB]); | [X]DE3721577 (TUBOS E CONEXOES TIGRE SA [BR]); | [E]EP0443134 (BOELLHOFF & CO [DE]) |