EP0431808 - Tag printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Yoshiaki A-202, 109 Makinogo, Shuzenji-cho Tagata, Shizuoka / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey, et al F.J. Cleveland & Company 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312808.0 | 26.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890319811 | 08.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31981189 | JP19900282325 | 19.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28232590 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431808 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431808 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06K1/12, G06K1/02, G06K19/08 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G06K1/126 (EP,US);
G06K1/02 (EP,US);
G06K19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Etikettendrucker | [1991/24] | English: | Tag printer | [1991/24] | French: | Imprimante d'étiquettes | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 06.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58056876 ; | [A]DE3620114 (DATA TEAM DATENTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2485770 (BONHOURE PATRICK [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 145 (M-224)24 June 1983 & JP-A-58 056 876 ( TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK ) 4 April 1983, & JP58056876 A 19830404 |