EP0435467 - Optical network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.1993 [1993/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STC PLC 1B Portland Place London W1N 3AA / GB | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bricheno, Terry Moorland View Great Sampford, Essex CB10 2RG / GB | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Dennis, Mark Charles, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Dennis, Mark Charles, et al Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow Essex CM20 2SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90312962.5 | 29.11.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | GB19890029014 | 22.12.1989 Original published format: GB 8929014 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435467 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435467 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/20, H04L12/44 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
H04L12/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/27] | Title | German: | Optisches Netzwerk | [1991/27] | English: | Optical network | [1991/27] | French: | Réseau optique | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 02.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/52] | 03.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3883222 (GUNDERSON LESLIE C); | [A]DE3235266 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [AD] - GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATION CONFERENCE vol. 3, December 1985, NEW YORK pages 1201 - 1205; PAYNE AND STERN: 'Single mode optical local networks' |