EP0431875 - Energy dispersal signal adding apparatus and energy dispersal signal removing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasahara, Mitsuhiro 3-17-3, Nagaonishimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573 / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313116.7 | 03.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890313475 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31347589 | JP19890313476 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31347689 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431875 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431875 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00, H04N7/04 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
H04N7/083 (EP);
H04N7/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/24] | H04N7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Addieren eines Signals zur Energie-Dispersion und Vorrichtung zur Beseitigung dieses Signals | [1991/24] | English: | Energy dispersal signal adding apparatus and energy dispersal signal removing apparatus | [1991/24] | French: | Dispositif d'addition d'un signal de dispersion d'énergie et dispositif pour supprimer ce signal | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 02.10.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/16] | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.09.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4589016 ; | [Y]US4257065 ; | [A]US4613902 ; | [A]US4389671 ; | [A]EP0128770 ; | [A]FR2615680 ; | [A]EP0306621 ; | [A]EP0235587 ; | [XP]EP0368378 ; | [AD]JPS58205380 ; | [A]JPS62102688 ; | [A]JPS6384285 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8no. 53 (E-231)(1490) 9 March 1984 & JP-A-58 205 380 ( NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI ) 30 November 1983 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11no. 309 (E-547)(2756) 8 October 1987 & JP-A-62 102 688 ( HITACHI LTD ) 13 May 1987 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12no. 320 (E-651)(3167) 30 August 1988 & JP-A-63 084 285 ( TOSHIBA CORPORATION ) 14 April 1988 | [A] - NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE RECORD, LOS ANGELES, 5-7 DECEMBER 1977, EDITED BY I.E.E.E. NEWYORK US , VOL3PAGES 41:1-1 TO 41:1-3 H.L. WEINBERGER: 'Tv Energy Dispersal Waveform' |