EP0434255 - Transmission shift lever biasing assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street Toledo, OH 43615 / US | [1991/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watson, Rick D. 2679 Thunderbird Trail Lambertville, MI 48144 / US | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M., et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [1991/26] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313140.7 | 04.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | US19890454089 | 19.12.1989 Original published format: US 454089 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0434255 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0434255 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434255 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/38, F16H61/24, G05G5/05 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
F16H63/38 (EP,US);
F16H21/00 (KR);
F16H63/36 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20116 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Getriebeschalthebelrückstellvorrichtung | [1991/26] | English: | Transmission shift lever biasing assembly | [1991/26] | French: | Assemblage prédisposant la position d'un levier de changement de vitesse | [1991/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/48] | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2428892 (PLEXICO ROBERT S); | [Y]US3164030 (FODREA JAMES W, et al); | [A]US3602245 (MEISEL WILLIAM H); | [A]US1830797 (ROBERT LAPSLEY); | [A]FR2169625 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |