EP0431931 - Plate member for use as material of light shielding blades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.1997 [1997/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsubara, Takashi 25-21-305 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313237.1 | 06.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | JP19890318244 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: JP 31824489 | JP19900247917 | 18.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24791790 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0431931 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0431931 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0431931 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/00 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G03B9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/24] | Title | German: | Plattenglied zum Gebrauch als Lichtabschirmblattmaterial | [1991/24] | English: | Plate member for use as material of light shielding blades | [1991/24] | French: | Plaque utilisable comme matériau de lame de protection contre la lumière | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 15.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE3919770 ; | [XP]EP0394996 ; | [A]DE8633679U |