EP0438890 - Unboundedly parallel simulations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1991/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greenberg, Albert G. 76 Chestnut Street Millburn, New Jersey 07041 / US | 02 /
Lubachevsky, Boris Dmitrievich 109 Milltown Road Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 03 /
Mitrani, Israel 2 Northumberland Avenue Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE34XE / GB | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313651.3 | 14.12.1990 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | US19900468524 | 23.01.1990 Original published format: US 468524 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438890 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438890 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438890 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
G06F30/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/31] | G06F15/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/31] | Title | German: | Nichtbegrenzte parallele Simulationen | [1991/31] | English: | Unboundedly parallel simulations | [1991/31] | French: | Simulations parallèles non limitées | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 18.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.03.1998 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1987 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PARALLEL PROCESSING AUGUST 17 - 21 1987 US pages 66 - 69 LUBACHEVSKY ET AL 'simple , efficient asynchronous parallel prefix algorithms' | [AD] - DISTRIBUTED SIMULATION 1989 THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER SIMULATION pages 53 - 57 CHANDY ET AL 'space - time and simulation' |