EP0436333 - Azaoxindole derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinson, Ralph P. 14 Barry Drive Gales Ferry, Connecticut 06335 / US | 02 /
Marfat, Anthony 160 Lantern Hill Road Mystic, Connecticut 06355 / US | [1991/28] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313669.5 | 14.12.1990 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | WO1990US00107 | 05.01.1990 Original published format: PCT/US90/00107 | [1991/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436333 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436333 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/44, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 209:00) | [1991/28] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/28] | Title | German: | Azaoxindolederivate | [1991/28] | English: | Azaoxindole derivatives | [1991/28] | French: | Dérivés de l'azaoxindole | [1991/28] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/28] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/36] | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0156603 (PFIZER [US]); | [YD]EP0164860 (PFIZER [US]); | [Y]EP0208510 (PFIZER [US]); | [Y]EP0347698 (SCHERING CORP [US]) |