EP0435556 - Tannin-containing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asama Chemical Co., Ltd. 20-3 Nihonbashi-kodenmacho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Izumitani, Maremitsu 18-9, Tokura 3-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | For all designated states MAMIE CORPORATION 16-10, Ohi 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Izumitani, Maremitsu 18-9, Tokura 3-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yajima, Mizuo 208, 9-16 Shirakawa, 4-chome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Phillip Kenneth, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Taylor, Phillip Kenneth, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313943.4 | 19.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890337266 | 25.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33726689 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0435556 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A23L1/29 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
A23G1/50 (EP,US);
A23F5/243 (EP);
A23G3/36 (EP);
A23G3/50 (EP);
A23L29/03 (EP);
A61K8/0212 (EP);
A61K8/602 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | Tannin enthaltende Komposition | [1991/27] | English: | Tannin-containing composition | [1991/27] | French: | Composition contenant des tannins | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59148712 ; | [X]EP0214317 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [X]DE449454 (AUGUST KUENZEL); | [X]GB1184922 (RENE RAMBAUD LAB [FR]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 8, no. 8, December 20, 1984 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 72 C 257 & JP,A,59-148 712 (KINGO), & JP59148712 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 10, no. 310, October 22, 1986 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 145 C 379 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 9, no. 241, September 27, 1985 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 29 C 306 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 7, no. 118, May 21, 1983 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 90 C 167 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 12, no. 15, January 16, 1988 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 95 C 469 | [A] - TASCHENBUCH DER MODERNEN PARF ̈MERIE UND KOSMETIK, 1966, Wissenschaftliche Ver- lagsgesellschaft M.B.H., Stuttgart H. JANISTYN |