EP0434418 - Speed limiter for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53222-2110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa, Wisconsin 53222-2110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dykstra, Richard Allen 169 Ramaker Avenue Cedar Grove, Wisconsin 53013 / US | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [1991/26] | Wright, Peter David John, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90313987.1 | 20.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | US19890454378 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: US 454378 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434418 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434418 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02P9/00, F02D31/00, F02P5/15 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
F02P9/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Drehzahlbegrenzer für Innenbrennkraftmaschinen | [1991/26] | English: | Speed limiter for internal combustion engines | [1991/26] | French: | Limiteur de vitesse pour moteur à combustion interne | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 10.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/16] | FR | 06.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4462356 (HIRT ADAM [DE]); | [A]US3884203 (CLIFFGARD ARNIE L); | [A]US3581720 (HEMPHILL LEWIS W, et al); | [A]US3665903 (HARRIS PAUL ANTHONY, et al); | [XP]US4977877 (DYKSTRA RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US4074665 (PATIS BRUCE L); | [A]US4336778 (HOWARD WILLIAM A); | [A]US4875448 (DYKSTRA RICHARD A [US]); | [A]US4404940 (SIEJA NORMAN F [US]) |