EP0436365 - Method and system for securing terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard Massachusetts 01745 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, Massachusetts 01745 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hu, Wei-Ming 51 Wright Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02174 / US | 02 /
Kahn, Clifford E. 15 Weld Street, Apt. 26 Framingham, Massachusetts 01701 / US | [1991/28] | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314097.8 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | US19890456672 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: US 456672 | [1991/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436365 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436365 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436365 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F12/14 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
G06F21/6281 (EP);
G06F2211/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Sicherung von Datenendgeräten | [1991/28] | English: | Method and system for securing terminals | [1991/28] | French: | Procédé et sytème pour protéger des terminaux | [1991/28] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/28] | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4591978 ; | [A]EP0151714 ; | [A]EP0326700 ; | [A]EP0067611 |