EP0436368 - Road vehicle brake lights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook, Ian Derek Grove House, Grove Lane Hillingdon Middlesex UB8 3RG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states Cook, Ian Derek Grove House, Grove Lane Hillingdon, Middlesex UB8 3RG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/28] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1991/28] | Application number, filing date | 90314125.7 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | GB19900000021 | 02.01.1990 Original published format: GB 9000021 | [1991/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436368 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436368 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/44 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
B60Q1/444 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/28] | Title | German: | Bremsleuchte für Fahrzeuge | [1991/28] | English: | Road vehicle brake lights | [1991/28] | French: | Feux de freinage pour véhicule routier | [1991/28] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/16] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3538886 ; | [X]FR2163878 ; | [X]DE3123277 ; | [X]GB2213658 |