EP0378476 - Box with knock-out openings for a flush-mounted apparatus, in particular an electrical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGRAND 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87045 Limoges Cédex / FR | [1990/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parlatore, Roger 10 Rue Corneille F-87920 Condat / FR | 02 /
Da Rocha, Jacques 10 Résidence des Vignes F-87350 Panazol / FR | 03 /
Combas, Christian Le Puy Roudier F-87240 Ambazac / FR | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400070.0 | 10.01.1990 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | FR19890000270 | 11.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8900270 | [1990/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378476 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378476 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/08 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
H02G3/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, IT, NL [1990/29] | Title | German: | Dose mit ausbrechbaren Öffnungen für Einbaugeräte, insbesondere für elektrische Geräte | [1990/29] | English: | Box with knock-out openings for a flush-mounted apparatus, in particular an electrical apparatus | [1990/29] | French: | Boîte à opercule(s) défonçable(s) pour appareil à encastrer, notamment pour appareil électrique | [1990/29] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2068988 (JOHN KNELL); | [A]FR2140886 (TELEMECANIQUE ELECTRIQUE); | [A]WO8501396 (NIELSEN ALF) |