EP0379405 - Method and apparatus for making a thermally adhesive textile-based product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAINIERE DE PICARDIE: Société anonyme B.P. 12 Buire-Courcelles 80200 Peronne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states LAINIERE DE PICARDIE: Société anonyme B.P. 12 Buire-Courcelles F-80200 Peronne / FR | ||
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states LAINIERE DE PICARDIE Société Anonyme Buire Courcelles, B.P. 12 F-80200 Peronne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groshens, Pierre 94 ter rue Joliot Curie, Doingt-Flamicourt F-80200 Peronne / FR | 02 /
Demoulin, Bernard 2- bis, rue du Marin F-80200 Peronne / FR | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al BOUJU DERAMBURE (BUGNION) S.A., 55 rue Boissonade 75014 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Michelet, Alain, et al BOUJU DERAMBURE (BUGNION) S.A., 55 rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400093.2 | 12.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | FR19890000387 | 13.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8900387 | [1990/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379405 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379405 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06B11/00 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
D06B11/0076 (EP,US);
D06B11/0066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer thermoklebenden Textilware | [1990/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for making a thermally adhesive textile-based product | [1990/30] | French: | Procédé et appareillage de fabrication d'un produit thermocollant a base textile | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE714100 ; | [A]FR2268646 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0097957 (SINTER LTD [GB]); | [XD]FR2586717 (PICARDIE LAINIERE [FR]); | [A]DE3623738 (KNOBEL RALF [DE]) |