EP0379409 - Products based on polymer particles containing melanine pigments, process for their preparation, and their use, particularly cosmetically [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grollier, Jean-François 16bis boulevard Morland F-75004 Paris / FR | 02 /
Mahieu, Claude 90, avenue de Villiers F-75017 Paris / FR | 03 /
Papantoniou, Christos 17, rue des Basserons F-95160 Montmorency / FR | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90400099.9 | 15.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | LU19890087429 | 17.01.1989 Original published format: LU 87429 | [1990/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379409 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379409 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/021, A61K7/13, A61K7/42, A61K7/48, C08K5/3417, C08L5/08, C08L33/12, C08L35/04, C08L83/04, C08L89/04 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/492 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP);
A61K8/65 (EP);
A61K8/72 (EP);
A61K8/736 (EP);
A61K8/88 (EP);
A61K8/891 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61Q1/10 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
C08K5/3417 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Produkte auf der Basis von Melaninpigmente enthaltenden Polymerpartikeln, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung, insbesondere in der Kosmetik | [1990/30] | English: | Products based on polymer particles containing melanine pigments, process for their preparation, and their use, particularly cosmetically | [1990/30] | French: | Produits à base de particules de polymère comportant des pigments mélaniques, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation, en particulier en cosmétique | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 07.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.1993 | DK | 15.09.1993 | GR | 15.09.1993 | NL | 15.09.1993 | SE | 15.09.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.09.1993 | |
DK | 15.09.1993 | ||
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 15.09.1993 | |
NL | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 15.09.1993 | |
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 15.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2371917 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]GB2197885 (OREAL); | [AP]GB2207153 (OREAL); | [XP]EP0313380 (ADVANCED POLYMER SYSTEMS INC [US]) |