EP0389306 - Procedure and inspecting an equipped printed circuit board, especially for inspecting the bonds on the board and apparatus for performing this procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quintard, Alain Résidence Bellevue, Bat. C3, Nozay F-91620 La Ville Du Bois / FR | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 58F35 68 route de Versailles 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Colombe, Michel, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA Poste courrier:LV 59C18 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1990/39] | Debay, Yves BULL S.A. Tour BULL Cédex 74 PC/TB2803 F-92039 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400136.9 | 18.01.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | FR19890000612 | 19.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8900612 | [1990/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389306 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389306 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389306 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/302, G01R31/308 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
G01N25/72 (EP);
G01R31/309 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Prüfung einer bestückten Karte mit gedruckter Schaltung, speziell zur Prüfung der Lötstellen der Karte und Gerät zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [1990/39] | English: | Procedure and inspecting an equipped printed circuit board, especially for inspecting the bonds on the board and apparatus for performing this procedure | [1990/39] | French: | Procédé pour le contrôle d'une carte de circuit imprimé équipée, notamment le contrôle des soudures de la carte et appareillage pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3868508 (LLOYD RAYMOND A) | [X] - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 28, no. 3, 1 février 1980, page 19, Rochelle Park, US; "Infrared imaging pins down PC-board solder-joint faults" | [A] - 28TH ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS CONFERENCE, Anaheim, CA, 24-26 avril 1978, pages 286-289, IEEE, New York, US; J.M. KONKLIN et al.: "The infrared signature for PC boards maintenance" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE, 19-21 novembre 1985, pages 413-418, IEEE, New York, US; H. BOULTON: "New concepts of applying thermographic testing to printed circuit boards and finished products" | [A] - ELECTRONICS TEST, vol. 11, no. 6, juin 1988, pages 89-90,92, San Francisco, US; K. POMEROY: "Pinpointing shorts with color thermography" | Examination | US4792683 |