EP0379433 - Catalyst and process for the oxidative dehydrogenation of propane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states NORSOLOR, Société Anonyme dite: 18 place des Reflets Tour Aurore F-92080 Paris la Défense 2 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mazzocchia, Carlo Via Teodosio 33 Milano / IT | 02 /
Tempesti, Ezio V. 1e Abruzzi 1 Milano / IT | 03 /
Aboumrad, Chafic Via Val di non 4 Milano / IT | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Rochet, Michel, et al ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1991/04] | Rochet, Michel ELF ATOCHEM S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 - Cedex 42 F-92091 Paris-La-Défense / FR | ||
Former [1990/30] | Chaillot, Geneviève Cabinet CHAILLOT, B.P. No. 74 F-92703 Colombes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400137.7 | 18.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | FR19890000552 | 18.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8900552 | [1990/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379433 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/88, C07C5/48, C07C11/06 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
B01J23/883 (EP,US);
C07C5/48 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C5/48, C07C11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Katalysator une Verfahren zur oxydativen Dehydrierung von Propan | [1990/30] | English: | Catalyst and process for the oxidative dehydrogenation of propane | [1990/30] | French: | Catalyseur et procédé de déshydrogénation oxydante du propane | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/03] | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/03] | Appeal following examination | 18.12.1991 | Appeal received | 01.04.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3303236 (CROCE LOUIS J, et al); | [X]DE1800063 (NII MONOMEROV DLJA SINT KAUCUK); | [AD]US3801671 (MARSHECK R); | [AD]US4131631 (HARDMAN HARLEY F); | [A]US4250346 (THORSTEINSON ERLIND M [US], et al); | [A]GB2068250 (NIKKI KK) |