EP0379436 - Apparatus and process for request arbitration and resolution of conflicts linked with the access to memories with independant banks for computing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.08.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNRS, Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique France Innovation Scientifique et Transfert, 135 Boulevard Saint Michel 75005 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6) 4, Place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 13 Quai Anatole France F-75700 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE PARIS VI 4, place Jussieu F-75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Dinechin, Benoît 84, Boulevard Raspail F-75006 Paris / FR | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Rodhain, Claude, et al Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400148.4 | 19.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | FR19890000689 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8900689 | [1990/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379436 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/18 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
G06F13/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/30] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Anforderungsarbitrierung und zur Auflösung von Konflikten, verbunden mit Zugriff zu Speichern mit unabhängigen Banken für Computergeräte | [1990/30] | English: | Apparatus and process for request arbitration and resolution of conflicts linked with the access to memories with independant banks for computing machines | [1990/30] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'arbitrage des requêtes et de résolution des conflits liés à l'accès aux mémoires à bancs indépendants pour les machines informatiques | [1990/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/38] | 09.05.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP57025054 [ ]; | [A]EP0004775 ; | [A]EP0242882 | [ ] - IEE PROCEEDINGS SECTIONS A A I, vol. 139, no. 4, part E, juillet 1983, pages 116-124, Old Woking, Surrey, GB; E.L. DAGLESS et al.: "Shared memories in the CYBA-M multimicroprocessor". | [A] - IEE PROCEEDINGS SECTIONS A A I | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.6, no. 88 (P-118)(966), 26 mai 1982; & JP-A- 57 025054 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 09.02.1982, & JP57025054 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN |