EP0379444 - Audio after recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaoka, Katsumi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400159.1 | 19.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | JP19890012475 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1247589 | JP19890012476 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1247689 | JP19890012477 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1247789 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379444 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379444 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379444 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21, G11B27/029, G11B27/36, G11B20/00, G11B19/06, G11B19/16 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B19/06 (EP,US);
G11B19/16 (EP,US);
G11B20/00007 (EP,US);
G11B27/029 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B27/026 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3264 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/30] | H04N1/21 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/30] | Title | German: | Gerät zur nachträglichen Speicherung von Audiosignalen | [1996/18] | English: | Audio after recording apparatus | [1990/30] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement rétractif de signaux de son | [1990/30] |
Former [1990/30] | Gerät zur Nachspeicherung von Hörsignalen | Examination procedure | 28.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57065078 ; | [X]JP63062486 ; | [Y]US4531161 (MURAKOSHI MAKOTO [JP]); | [A]EP0186883 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]US4602296 (MURAKOSHI MAKOTO [JP]); | [A]US4725897 (KONISHI MASAHIRO [JP]); | [Y]US4764817 (BLAZEK JOHN M [US], et al); | [X]EP0295148 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0223423 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 140, (E-121)[1018], 29th July 1982; & JP-A-57 065 078 (CANON K.K) 20-04-1982, & JP57065078 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 287 (E-643)[3134], 5th August 1988; & JP-A-63 062 486 (FUJI PHOTO FIILM CO., LTD) 18-03-1988, & JP63062486 A 00000000 |