EP0384803 - Thermal decomposition trap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/35] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirase, Ikuo 5-9-9 Tokodai Toyosato-machi, Tsucuba-Gun 300-26 / JP | [1990/35] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1990/35] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400372.0 | 12.02.1990 | [1990/35] | Priority number, date | EP19890400388 | 13.02.1989 Original published format: EP 89400388 | [1990/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0384803 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0384803 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/46 (EP,US);
B01D53/68 (EP,US);
B01D53/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1990/35] | Title | German: | Falle für thermische Zersetzung | [1990/35] | English: | Thermal decomposition trap | [1990/35] | French: | Piège pour décomposition thermique | [1990/35] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - C.F. POWELL et al.: "Vapor-plating", 1955, pages 8-9, John Wiley & Sons, New York, US | [A] - JOURNAL OF METALS, vol. 37, no. 6, June 1985, pages 63-71, Warrendale, Pennsylvania, US; M.L. GREEN et al.: "Chemical vapor deposition of metals for integrated circuit applications" |