EP0383680 - Pentamidine solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SANTE 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SANTE 20, avenue Raymond Aron F-92160 Antony / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lord, John David 89, Fairlop Road, Leytonstone London E11 / GB | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Pilard, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC SANTE, Service Brevets, 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Pilard, Jacques, et al RHONE-POULENC SANTE, Service Brevets, 20 Avenue Raymond Aron F-92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400398.5 | 14.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | GB19890003438 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903438 | GB19890022707 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8922707 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383680 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383680 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383680 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/155, A61K47/12, A61K9/72 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/155 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K9/0078 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Pentamidinlösungen | [1990/34] | English: | Pentamidine solutions | [1990/34] | French: | Solutions de la pentamidine | [1990/34] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0221700 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [A]EP0292100 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) | [A] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HOSPITAL PHARMACY, Vol. 43, June 1986, pages 1486-1488, American Society of Hospital Pharmacists, Inc.; C.D. NIMAI et al.: "Stability of pentamidine isethionate in 5% dextrose and 0.9% sodium chloride injections". | [A] - J.E.F. REYNOLDS: "Martindale The Extra Pharmacopoeia", Edition 28, 1982, pages 982-983, The Pharmaceutical Press, London, GB; |