EP0445476 - Method and apparatus for enhancing production capacity and flexibility of a multi-tier refrigeration tunnel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIQUID AIR CORPORATION California Plaza 2121 North California Boulevard Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states LIQUID AIR CORPORATION California Plaza 2121 North California Boulevard Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hubert, Jean-Luc 6103 Knollwood Road, 313 Willowbrook Illinois 60514 / US | 02 /
Bajcar, Miles S. 10445 Alta Drive Palos Hills, Illinois 60465 / US | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1991/37] | Vesin, Jacques L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400620.2 | 08.03.1990 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445476 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/11 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
F25D25/04 (EP,US);
F25D3/11 (EP,US);
F25D2317/0681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erhöhung der Produktionskapazität und Anpassungsfähigkeit eines Mehrlagen-Kühltunnels | [1991/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for enhancing production capacity and flexibility of a multi-tier refrigeration tunnel | [1991/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour augmenter la capacité de production et la flexibilité d'un tunnel de réfrigération à plusieurs rangées | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/10] | 20.10.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3892104 (KLEE DAVID J, et al); | [AD]US3813895 (KLEE D, et al); | [A]US4475351 (KLEE DAVID J [US]); | [A]US4757691 (COMPAGNON JEAN [FR]); | [AD]US3708995 (BERG D); | [A]US1865168 (VICTOR BUHR); | [A]WO8900963 (GRANDI RENE [FR]); | [A]US3605434 (BOESE HAROLD L); | [A]US3553973 (MORAN JACK K); | [A]US4157018 (GOLTSOS COSTAS E [US]); | [A]US3952540 (OKADA NOBUHIKO, et al); | [A]GB2134238 (BOC GROUP INC); | [E]US4912943 (HUBERT JEAN-LUC [US], et al); | [A]FR952185 (PUNCH ENGINEERING PTY); | [A]US4726766 (STEWART G WAYNE [US], et al); | [A]US4803851 (STOKES MALCOLM L [GB]) |