EP0394117 - Multi-layered coating and thermal insulating element with such a coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Industrielle de l'Ouest des produits Isolants" OUEST-ISOL" Chemin de Rouville BP 15 27460 Alizay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states Société Industrielle de l'Ouest des produits Isolants" OUEST-ISOL" Chemin de Rouville BP 15 F-27460 Alizay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fenart, Etienne Le Genetey, Chemin St. Gorgon F-76840 St. Martin de Boscherville / FR | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401031.1 | 17.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | FR19890005149 | 18.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8905149 | [1990/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394117 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394117 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, F16L59/10 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
F16L59/026 (EP);
F16L59/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL [1990/43] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiger Überzug und thermisch isolierendes Element mit einem solchen Überzug | [1990/43] | English: | Multi-layered coating and thermal insulating element with such a coating | [1990/43] | French: | Revêtement stratifié, élément thermiquement isolant pourvu d'un tel revêtement | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2737495 ; | [A]CH596490 ; | [A]US4268567 ; | [A]US4142565 |