EP0395525 - Method for manufacturing pasty food products and products obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FROMAGERIES BEL 4, rue d'Anjou 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states FROMAGERIES BEL 4, rue d'Anjou F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoegel, Francine 1,rue Sebile F-39000 Long le Saunier / FR | 02 /
Daurelles, Jacques Les Toupes Montain F-39210 Voiteur / FR | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401145.9 | 26.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | FR19890005706 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8905706 | [1990/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395525 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395525 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/06, B65D85/76 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
B65B25/068 (EP);
A23C19/0765 (EP);
A23C19/0976 (EP);
B65D85/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung pastöser Lebensmittelzubereitungen sowie auf diese Weise erzeugte Produkte | [1990/44] | English: | Method for manufacturing pasty food products and products obtained thereby | [1990/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de produits alimentaires pâteux et produits obtenus par ce procédé | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.1993 | DK | 01.09.1993 | ES | 01.09.1993 | GR | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | SE | 01.09.1993 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 01.09.1993 | |
DK | 01.09.1993 | ||
GR | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 01.09.1993 | |
DK | 01.09.1993 | ||
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | NL | 01.09.1993 | |
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2450065 (JULIEN ANDRE); | [YD]DE3708839 (MAIZENA GMBH [DE]) |