EP0398789 - Inhalant containing methoxamine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE PARIS V 12 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states UNIVERSITE DE PARIS V 12 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine F-75006 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cabanes, Laure 10 rue Dulac F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Lockhart, Alain 150 Avenue du Maine F-75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
Weber, Simon 32 rue de Lagny F-75020 Paris / FR | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401247.3 | 10.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | FR19890006380 | 16.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8906380 | [1990/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398789 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398789 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K9/12, A61K9/72 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
A61K9/0073 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/47] | Title | German: | Methoxamin enthaltende Arzneizubereitung für inhalatorische Anwendungen | [1990/47] | English: | Inhalant containing methoxamine | [1990/47] | French: | Composition administrable par inhalation à base de méthoxamine | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.1992 | DE | 09.12.1992 | DK | 09.12.1992 | GB | 09.12.1992 | IT | 09.12.1992 | NL | 09.12.1992 | SE | 09.12.1992 | BE | 31.05.1993 | CH | 31.05.1993 | LI | 31.05.1993 | LU | 31.05.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
DK | 09.12.1992 | ||
GB | 09.12.1992 | ||
IT | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
BE | 31.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
DK | 09.12.1992 | ||
GB | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
BE | 31.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
GB | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
BE | 31.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
DE | 09.12.1992 | ||
GB | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | DE | 09.12.1992 | |
GB | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.05.1993 | ||
LI | 31.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | DE | 09.12.1992 | |
GB | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | DE | 09.12.1992 | |
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
SE | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | DE | 09.12.1992 | |
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | NL | 09.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3891757 (HIGUCHI TAKERU) | [AP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, Banque de Données: MEDLINE, accès no. 89238446; L.R. CABANES et al.: "Bronchial hyperresponsiveness to methacholine in patients with impaired left ventricular function", & N. ENGL. J. MED. (UNITED STATES) 18-05-1989, 320 (20) p1317-22 |