EP0404629 - Signalling lights for road vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société anonyme dite: COMPAGNIE D'EQUIPEMENTS AUTOMOBILES AXO Route de Dampierre, B P 40 F-78321 Le Mesnil ST Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states Société anonyme dite: COMPAGNIE D'EQUIPEMENTS AUTOMOBILES AXO Route de Dampierre, B P 40 F-78321 Le Mesnil ST Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mauvière, Jean-Paul Route du Hamel, Les Baux Sainte Croix F-27930 Evreux / FR | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Faber, Jean-Paul CABINET FABER 35, rue de Berne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Faber, Jean-Paul CABINET FABER 35, rue de Berne F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401595.5 | 11.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | FR19890008106 | 19.06.1989 Original published format: FR 8908106 | [1990/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404629 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0404629 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F21Q1/00 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
F21S43/255 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1990/52] | Title | German: | Signalleuchten für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1990/52] | English: | Signalling lights for road vehicles | [1990/52] | French: | Feux de signalisation de véhicules automobiles | [1994/43] |
Former [1990/52] | Perfectionnements aux feux de signalisation de véhicules automobiles | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 28.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2493960 ; | [Y]DE1655784 ; | [A]FR1497912 ; | [A]DE3115024 ; | [A]DE956566 ; | [A]DE1016371 |