EP0408406 - Tunable high power laser source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pocholle, Jean-Paul THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris La Défense / FR | 02 /
Papuchon, Michel THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris La Défense / FR | 03 /
Puech, Claude THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris La Défense / FR | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401678.9 | 15.06.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | FR19890009303 | 11.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8909303 | [1991/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408406 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/30, G02F1/39 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
H01S3/305 (EP,US);
G02F1/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/03] | Title | German: | Abstimmbare Hochleistungs-Laserquelle | [1991/03] | English: | Tunable high power laser source | [1991/03] | French: | Source laser de puissance accordable | [1991/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/14] | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4327337 (LIU YUNG S); | [A]FR2438358 (US ENERGY [US]) | [X] - SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. 18, no. 8, août 1988, pages 1035-1037, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; R.R. BUZYALIS et al.: "Parametric generation of tunable picosecond light pulses as a result of pumping with radiation from a stimulated Raman scattering compressor" | [X] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. QE-18, no. 8, août 1988, pages 1246-1252, IEEE, New York, US; D.G. BRUNS et al.: "Scalable visible Nd: YAG pumped Raman laser source" | [A] - LASER UND OPTOELEKTRONIK, vol. 18, no. 4, décembre 1986, pages 311-318, Stuttgart, DE; A. SEILMEIER et al.: "Tunable picosecond light pulses generated by parametric three-photon interaction" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 49, no. 11, 15 septembre 1986, pages 608-610, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; R.C. ECKARDT et al.: "Broadly tunable infrared parametric oscillator using AgGaSe2" |