EP0442227 - Guiding device of a tubular element for rolling up a sail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NOUVELLE DES ATELIERS ET CHANTIERS DU HAVRE 30 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau 76600 Le Havre / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states SOCIETE NOUVELLE DES ATELIERS ET CHANTIERS DU HAVRE 30 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau F-76600 Le Havre / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faury, François 6, rue Géricault F-76600 Le Havre / FR | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Madeuf, Claude Alexandre Jean, et al CABINET MADEUF 3, avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Madeuf, Claude Alexandre Jean, et al CABINET MADEUF 3, avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401863.7 | 28.06.1990 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | FR19900001740 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001740 | [1991/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442227 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B63H9/10 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
B63H9/1035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Führungsvorrichtung für eine Segelaufrollröhre | [1991/34] | English: | Guiding device of a tubular element for rolling up a sail | [1991/34] | French: | Dispositif de guidage d'un tube enrouleur de grand-voile | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1990 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 31.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/25] | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0325074 ; | [A]GB921723 ; | [A]US4267790 |