EP0409714 - Turbocharger operation optimisation device for internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiphaine, Jean 6 rue Saint Charles F-78580 Maule / FR | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402046.8 | 16.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | FR19890009725 | 19.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8909725 | [1991/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409714 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409714 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/12 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
F02B37/12 (EP);
F02B37/22 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Betriebsoptimierung eines Turboladers von Brennkraftmaschinen | [1991/04] | English: | Turbocharger operation optimisation device for internal combustion engines | [1991/04] | French: | Dispositif d'optimisation du fonctionnement d'un turbocompresseur de suralimentation d'un moteur à combustion | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3246483 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]); | [A]GB2034402 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]EP0203590 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US2559623 (HOLMES GIFFORD I); | [A]FR2615902 (USUI KOKUSAI SANGYO KK [JP], et al); | [A]US3257796 (UPDIKE STANLEY H) |