EP0409723 - Multi-purpose woodworking machine with modular tools [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUREM S.A. La Haute Chapelle B.P. no 1 F-61700 Domfront / FR | [1991/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobignard, Patrice 16, rue du Docteur Poulain F-61600 La Ferté-Macé / FR | [1993/41] |
Former [1991/04] | 01 /
Dobignard, Patrice 16, rue du Docteur Poulain F -61600 La Ferte-Mace / FR | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402058.3 | 17.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | FR19890009799 | 20.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8909799 | [1991/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409723 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0409723 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B27C9/02, B23Q37/00 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B27C9/02 (EP);
B23Q37/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Holzbearbeitungsmaschine mit mehreren modularen Werkzeugen | [1991/04] | English: | Multi-purpose woodworking machine with modular tools | [1991/04] | French: | Machine à bois à outils multiples modulaires | [1991/04] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.1993 | DE | 13.10.1993 | DK | 13.10.1993 | ES | 13.10.1993 | GB | 13.10.1993 | IT | 13.10.1993 | NL | 13.10.1993 | SE | 13.10.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
DK | 13.10.1993 | ||
ES | 13.10.1993 | ||
GB | 13.10.1993 | ||
IT | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
DK | 13.10.1993 | ||
GB | 13.10.1993 | ||
IT | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
DK | 13.10.1993 | ||
GB | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
GB | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | SE | 13.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1506154 (VILHELM BERTHELSEN HANS JENS, et al); | [A]DE937011 (SCHMANNS HANS-PETER); | [A]US2759507 (DAVIS ROBERT K, et al); | [A]US2813432 (HOSKINS RUSSELL E); | [X]US3036608 (CARL WEBER); | [A]DE2819033 (STANLEY WERKE GMBH); | [A]US4265283 (NASH EDWARD M, et al); | [A]EP0121609 (STEPHAN WERKE GMBH & CO [DE]) |