EP0409724 - Multi-purpose woodworking machine and modulator tools for same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUREM S.A. La Haute Chapelle B.P. no 1 F-61700 Domfront / FR | [1991/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobignard, Patrice 16, rue du Docteur Poulain F-61600 La Ferté-Macé / FR | [1991/04] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402059.1 | 17.07.1990 | [1991/04] | Priority number, date | FR19890009800 | 20.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8909800 | [1991/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0409724 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B27C9/02 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B27C9/005 (EP);
B27C9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | Mehrzweckholzbearbeitungsmaschine und modulare Werkzeuge dafür | [1991/04] | English: | Multi-purpose woodworking machine and modulator tools for same | [1991/04] | French: | Machine à bois à outils multiples et outils modulaires pour cette machine | [1991/04] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2813432 ; | [A]FR1008394 ; | [A]EP0121609 |