EP0413631 - Nitrogen production process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | For all designated states LIQUID AIR ENGINEERING CORPORATION 1155 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 1H8 / CA | For all designated states TEISAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA Nihon Gas Kyokai Bldg. 7F, No. 15-12 Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
For all designated states LIQUID AIR ENGINEERING CORPORATION 1155 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 1H8 / CA | |||
For all designated states TEISAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA Nihon Gas Kyokai Bldg. 7F, No. 15-12 Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gastinne, Sophie 75 Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 02 /
Venet, Francois 75 Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 03 /
Ha, Bao 75 Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | 04 /
Yamashita, Naohiko 75 Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1991/08] | Vesin, Jacques L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402289.4 | 13.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | FR19890011009 | 18.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8911009 | [1991/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413631 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413631 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
F25J3/04393 (EP,US);
F25J3/0429 (EP,US);
F25J3/04296 (EP,US);
F25J3/04351 (EP,US);
F25J3/04357 (EP,US);
F25J3/044 (EP,US);
F25J3/0443 (EP,US);
F25J3/04509 (EP,US);
F25J2200/50 (EP,US);
F25J2200/52 (EP,US);
F25J2200/54 (EP,US);
F25J2200/72 (EP);
F25J2215/44 (EP,US);
F25J2220/42 (EP,US);
F25J2245/40 (EP,US);
F25J2245/42 (EP,US);
Y10S62/901 (EP,US);
Y10S62/913 (EP,US);
Y10S62/939 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/08] | Title | German: | Stickstoffgasherstellungsverfahren | [1991/08] | English: | Nitrogen production process | [1991/08] | French: | Procédé de production d'azote | [1991/08] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/52: Teilanmeldung 94106964.3 eingereicht am 13/08/90 | EPB 1994/52: Divisional application 94106964.3 filed on 13/08/90 | EPB 1994/52: Demande divisionnaire 94106964.3 déposée le 13/08/90 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 17.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94106964.3 / EP0610972 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Request for further processing for: | 19.10.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 19.10.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 28.12.1994 | ES | 28.12.1994 | SE | 28.03.1995 | BE | 31.08.1995 | CH | 31.08.1995 | LI | 31.08.1995 | LU | 31.08.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | DK | 28.12.1994 | |
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
CH | 31.08.1995 | ||
LI | 31.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 28.12.1994 | |
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
CH | 31.08.1995 | ||
LI | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1997/28] | SE | 28.03.1995 | |
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
CH | 31.08.1995 | ||
LI | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | SE | 28.03.1995 | |
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | SE | 28.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0183446 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [X]US4662918 (AGRAWAL RAKESH [US], et al); | [A]US4834785 (AYRES CALVIN L [US]); | [AP]EP0357299 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]) | Examination | US4662917 |